TN HB9040 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the offense of requiring another to wear a mask for the purpose of preventing the spread of COVID-19 as condition of employment or in order to enter any building, facility, or property that is generally open to the public. - Amends TCA Title 29 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29 and Title 39, relative to mask requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9031 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee