TN HB9023 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "COVID-19 Health Care Liberty Jurisdiction Act." - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 26; Title 50, Chapter 6; Title 53, Chapter 1 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 26; Title 50, Chapter 6; Title 53, Chapter 1 and Title 68, relative to the COVID-19 Health Care Liberty Jurisdiction Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | No Action Taken |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9064 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee