TN HB9012 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person or entity that requires COVID-19 vaccination or proof of COVID-19 vaccination except in cases of religious exemption to include in the religious exemption any person who is a member of a recognized religious sect or division and is an adherent of established tenets or teachers of such sect or division by reason of which the person is conscientiously opposed to receiving a COVID-19 vaccination. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29 and Title 68, relative to religious exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9026 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 10/28/2021