TN HB9001 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, applies liability for side effects of a COVID-19 vaccination to an employer or private institution of higher education that requires the vaccination for employment or enrollment; amends the Tennessee COVID-19 Recovery Act's definition of "arising from COVID-19" to exclude vaccinations for COVID-19. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 49 and Title 50, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 49 and Title 50, Chapter 6, relative to civil liability related to COVID-19.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-28HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
2021-10-28HousePlaced on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28HouseP2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
2021-10-27HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-10-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB9004 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback