TN SB9004 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, applies liability for side effects of a COVID-19 vaccination to an employer or private institution of higher education that requires the vaccination for employment or enrollment; amends the Tennessee COVID-19 Recovery Act's definition of "arising from COVID-19" to exclude vaccinations for COVID-19. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 49 and Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20; Title 49 and Title 50, Chapter 6, relative to civil liability related to COVID-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB9001 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III