TN HB8002 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 55-5)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 55-5)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the law concerning the electronic delivery of health care and its coverage under certain insurance policies and TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Section 63-1-155.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the law concerning the electronic delivery of health care and its coverage under certain insurance policies and TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Section 63-1-155.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Pub. Ch. 4 | |
2020-08-27 | Effective date(s) 08/17/2020 | |
2020-08-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-08-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-08-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-08-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 1 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA8002) |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-08-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-08-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-08-12 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA8014) |
2020-08-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA8003) |
2020-08-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II |
2020-08-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II |
2020-08-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session II |
2020-08-11 | House | Placed on cal. Electronic Delivery of Healthcare Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Electronic Delivery of Healthcare Committee |
2020-08-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-08-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB8003 (Crossfiled) 2020-08-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4