TN HB7071 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-28 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the bureau to submit a report on the number of mass shootings that occur in this state to the governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the speaker of the senate by January 1, 2024, and by each January 1 thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 38.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, relative to reporting of mass shootings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 1 BY PEARSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 22 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-28SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-08-25HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-08-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-24HousePassed H., Ayes 75, Nays 15, PNV 3
2023-08-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/24/23
2023-08-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/24/2023
2023-08-23HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session
2023-08-22HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 8/23/2023
2023-08-22HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-08-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023
2023-08-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-08-22HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-08-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-18HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7018 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback