TN HB7041 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the bureau to submit a report on child and human trafficking crimes and trends in this state, based upon data available to the bureau, as well as current programs and activities of the bureau's human trafficking unit, to the governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the speaker of the senate by December 1, 2023, and by each December 1 thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, Chapter 6, relative to Tennessee bureau of investigation reports on the status of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] |
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Brock Martin [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Kevin Raper [R] |
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-08-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/24/23 |
2023-08-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/24/2023 |
2023-08-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-08-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-08-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-08-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7088 (Crossfiled) 2023-09-08 - Signed by Governor.