TN HB7023 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a law enforcement agency to assign a law enforcement officer to serve as a school resource officer at a school within a local board of education's control that has not entered into a memorandum of understanding with a law enforcement agency to assign a school resource officer to the school. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 37; Title 38; Title 49 and Title 62.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 37; Title 38; Title 49 and Title 62, relative to law enforcement at schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY PEARSON AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 19 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-08-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - House - HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - House - HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-08-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2023-08-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA7013) |
2023-08-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/24/23 |
2023-08-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/24/2023 |
2023-08-24 | House | Rec. for pass. ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/24/2023 |
2023-08-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/24/2023 |
2023-08-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-08-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-08-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-08-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7015 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table