TN HB3995 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pr. Ch. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pr. Ch. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, transfers probate court clerk responsibility from county clerk to clerk and master; transfers juvenile court clerk responsibility from county clerk to circuit court clerk. - Amends Chapter 82 of the Private Acts of 1989.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, transfers probate court clerk responsibility from county clerk to clerk and master; transfers juvenile court clerk responsibility from county clerk to circuit court clerk. - Amends Chapter 82 of the Private Acts of 1989.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pr. Ch. 77 | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-08 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-06-04 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-05-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-13 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-13 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1507) | |
2010-05-13 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-05-10 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/13/10 | |
2010-05-10 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-06 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/10/10 | |
2010-05-05 | P2C held on desk. | |
2010-04-29 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-04-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3957 (Crossfiled)
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3995&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3995.pdf |