TN HB3963 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a state employee, teacher, or state university and college system or University of Tennessee employee member to, upon retirement and in lieu of using sick leave as a creditable service under present law, use accumulated sick leave in the same manner as annual or compensatory leave in order to reach the employee's retirement date or have such sick leave be paid to the employee as a lump sum payment. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a state employee, teacher, or state university and college system or University of Tennessee employee member to, upon retirement and in lieu of using sick leave as a creditable service under present law, use accumulated sick leave in the same manner as annual or compensatory leave in order to reach the employee's retirement date or have such sick leave be paid to the employee as a lump sum payment. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Odom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-02-25 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-22 | P1C. | |
2010-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3915 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3963&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3963.pdf |