TN HB3936 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-08 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/09/10
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-08 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/09/10
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises commission membership and quorum provisions. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, revises commission membership and quorum provisions. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/09/10 | |
2010-06-08 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/09/10 | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Conservation & Environment Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in Conservation & Environment Committee to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Conservation & Environment Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Wildlife of CON for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to s/c Wildlife of CON | |
2010-03-17 | Ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2010-02-18 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2010-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3061 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-23 - Action Def. in S. E,C&T Comm. to 3/30/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3936&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3936.pdf |