TN HB3882 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises method for filling vacancies on board of mayor and aldermen; allows for recall elections of mayor and aldermen. - Amends Chapter 24 of the Private Acts of 1997; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises method for filling vacancies on board of mayor and aldermen; allows for recall elections of mayor and aldermen. - Amends Chapter 24 of the Private Acts of 1997; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pr. Ch. 74 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-27 | Passed S., Ayes 28, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-27 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-04-26 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-04-25 | Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-24 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-05 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-04-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3811 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 74