TN HB3834 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from three days to five days, the amount of time an owner has to legally claim a dog or cat that is not wearing a vaccination tag or other identification, before the dog or cat may be adopted or destroyed. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As introduced, increases from three days to five days, the amount of time an owner has to legally claim a dog or cat that is not wearing a vaccination tag or other identification, before the dog or cat may be adopted or destroyed. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - House - HEALTH & HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Health & Human Resources Committee (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Health & Human Resources Committee (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to last calendar | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Health & Human Resources | |
2010-02-16 | Sponsor change. | |
2010-02-08 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2010-02-04 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3850 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.