TN HB3758 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires notice be given of closure of state-owned residential facilities for persons with mental retardation or other developmental disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires notice be given of closure of state-owned residential facilities for persons with mental retardation or other developmental disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/28/2010 Mtg. canceled | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Health Care Facilities of HHR for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to s/c Health Care Facilities of HHR | |
2010-02-08 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-01 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3729 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-07 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3758&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3758.pdf |