TN HB3720 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-08 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-08 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a task force to study the statewide replication of Carroll Academy. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, creates a task force to study the statewide replication of Carroll Academy. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Maddox [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Held on desk. | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Budget of FW&M | |
2010-05-14 | Placed on s/c cal Study Committee Sub-committee of Budget for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Assigned to s/c Study Committee Sub-committee of Budget | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Action Def. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Action Def. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA to 3/2/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Family Justice of C&FA | |
2010-02-04 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3661 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-10 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3720&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3720.pdf |