TN HB3700 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 951
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 951
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that a defendant cannot get records expunged if convicted of an offense other than the charged offense or convicted of one offense in a multi-count indictment, including lesser included offenses. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that a defendant cannot get records expunged if convicted of an offense other than the charged offense or convicted of one offense in a multi-count indictment, including lesser included offenses. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 951 | |
2012-04-24 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-05 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3642 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 951