TN HB3697 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1023
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1023
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires members of local and regional planning commissions to file disclosure statements of conflict of interests with Tennessee ethics commission. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, requires members of local and regional planning commissions to file disclosure statements of conflict of interests with Tennessee ethics commission. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gotto [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1023 | |
2012-04-26 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3649 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 1023