TN HB3557 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes certain presumptions and conclusive determinations regarding the determination of whether a person is an "employee" or an "independent contractor" for purposes of the workers compensation law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, establishes certain presumptions and conclusive determinations regarding the determination of whether a person is an "employee" or an "independent contractor" for purposes of the workers compensation law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action def. in Consumer & Employee Affairs to 4/28/2010 Mtg.Canceled | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3750 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3557&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3557.pdf |