TN HB3499 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Pub. Ch. 1073
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Pub. Ch. 1073
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that at least one staff member at the Tennessee school for the blind, the Tennessee school for the deaf, and the West Tennessee school for the deaf become certified as a CPR instructor and be responsible for training other members of the school in CPR. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, requires that at least one staff member at the Tennessee school for the blind, the Tennessee school for the deaf, and the West Tennessee school for the deaf become certified as a CPR instructor and be responsible for training other members of the school in CPR. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Pub. Ch. 1073 | |
2010-06-28 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-08 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-06-04 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-06-03 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-06-03 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-06-03 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-03 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1343) | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for pass; ref to Education Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2010-03-17 | Ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2789 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1073