TN HB3464 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Action def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Action def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a claimant submitting evidence of actual damages in a personal injury action to submit into evidence the amount charged by providers for any services received as a result of the injury and the actual amount paid by the claimant for such services if the amounts differ. - Amends TCA Title 24; Title 25 and Title 29.
Title
As introduced, requires a claimant submitting evidence of actual damages in a personal injury action to submit into evidence the amount charged by providers for any services received as a result of the injury and the actual amount paid by the claimant for such services if the amounts differ. - Amends TCA Title 24; Title 25 and Title 29.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Action def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3820 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-01 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3464&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3464.pdf |