TN HB3406 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs TSSAA to develop a policy prohibiting athletic events from being scheduled contiguously with commencement ceremonies. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, directs TSSAA to develop a policy prohibiting athletic events from being scheduled contiguously with commencement ceremonies. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 4/07/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3265 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3406&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3406.pdf |