TN HB3372 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that if a treating physician determines that pain is persisting for an injured or disabled employee beyond an expected period for healing, then the treating physician, if the physician is a "qualified physician", may either prescribe or refer such employee for pain management, encompassing pharmacological, non-pharmacological and other approaches to manage chronic pain. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Title
As enacted, specifies that if a treating physician determines that pain is persisting for an injured or disabled employee beyond an expected period for healing, then the treating physician, if the physician is a "qualified physician", may either prescribe or refer such employee for pain management, encompassing pharmacological, non-pharmacological and other approaches to manage chronic pain. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSUMER & EMPLOYEE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) C&EA SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Consumer & Employee Affairs Com (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSUMER & EMPLOYEE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) C&EA SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Consumer & Employee Affairs Com (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1100 | |
2012-05-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-30 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-23 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to next calendar | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-04-17 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee to 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to s/c C&EA Subcommittee | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3315 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1100