TN HB3230 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1131
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1131
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department, in consultation with the department of environment and conservation, to conduct a study relative to recurring flooding near the Sunshine Community in Blount County caused by clearing a landslide from the highway running parallel to the Little River into such river. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54 and Title 69.
Title
As enacted, requires the department, in consultation with the department of environment and conservation, to conduct a study relative to recurring flooding near the Sunshine Community in Blount County caused by clearing a landslide from the highway running parallel to the Little River into such river. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54 and Title 69.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1131 | |
2010-06-08 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-05-19 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/25/2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-05-11 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/11/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/11/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 5/4/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Rural Roads of TR for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Rural Roads of TR | |
2010-02-10 | Ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3538 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1131
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3230&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3230.pdf |