TN HB3164 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 962
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 962
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the tax on unauthorized substances based on the decision of the Tennessee Supreme Court in Waters v. Farr to impose the tax on the merchant of unauthorized substances. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 28.
Title
As enacted, revises the tax on unauthorized substances based on the decision of the Tennessee Supreme Court in Waters v. Farr to impose the tax on the merchant of unauthorized substances. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 28.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Pub. Ch. 962 | |
2010-06-07 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-05-14 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-05-13 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-12 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-11 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-05-10 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-10 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-05-06 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-05-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-05 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2 | |
2010-05-05 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1245) | |
2010-05-04 | H. Placed on Tentative Regular Calendar for 5/05/10 | |
2010-05-04 | Reset on Tentative cal. for 5/05/10 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Judiciary | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3134 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962