TN HB3154 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates search committee to recommend to the governor candidates for the position of executive director of the state film, entertainment and music commission. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 50.
Title
As introduced, creates search committee to recommend to the governor candidates for the position of executive director of the state film, entertainment and music commission. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/28/2010 Mtg. Canceled | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Commerce | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2769 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-29 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3154&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3154.pdf |