TN HB3108 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that certain information regarding advanced placement courses and dual enrollment courses be included in commissioner's annual report. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires that certain information regarding advanced placement courses and dual enrollment courses be included in commissioner's annual report. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1014 | |
2012-04-26 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-03-29 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-19 | Sponsor change. | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2866 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 1014