TN HB3098 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1072
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1072
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the issuance of licenses to teach in grades nine through 12 to persons who have taught at a postsecondary education institution, the students of which are eligible for lottery funded scholarships; such a license will only authorize the licensee to teach in the subject area in which the licensee taught at the higher education institution. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the issuance of licenses to teach in grades nine through 12 to persons who have taught at a postsecondary education institution, the students of which are eligible for lottery funded scholarships; such a license will only authorize the licensee to teach in the subject area in which the licensee taught at the higher education institution. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1072 | |
2012-05-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-30 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-27 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-27 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Re-referred To: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-19 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-03-29 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2302 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1072