TN HB3070 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes fair market value bid when less than amount due for taxes, interest, penalties, and the collection costs at tax sales of certain types of real property located in empowerment zones or renewal communities in Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes fair market value bid when less than amount due for taxes, interest, penalties, and the collection costs at tax sales of certain types of real property located in empowerment zones or renewal communities in Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/19/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/19/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/2/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2811 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-03 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3070&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3070.pdf |