TN HB3063 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits physicians on sexual offender registry from treating children under 18 years. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, prohibits physicians on sexual offender registry from treating children under 18 years. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Held on desk. | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3739 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-01 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3063&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3063.pdf |