TN HB3031 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the castle doctrine to prohibit a person from criminal prosecution or civil action in the use of force which is justified; directs the commissioner of commerce and insurance to determine whether there are impediments inhibiting insurance companies from underwriting coverage for such events. - Amends TCA Section 39-11-622 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, revises the castle doctrine to prohibit a person from criminal prosecution or civil action in the use of force which is justified; directs the commissioner of commerce and insurance to determine whether there are impediments inhibiting insurance companies from underwriting coverage for such events. - Amends TCA Section 39-11-622 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to last calendar | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3310 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3031&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3031.pdf |