TN HB2999 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 830
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 830
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that LEAs may expend BEP funds earned for non-classroom components for the purpose of employing a building manager for a school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, specifies that LEAs may expend BEP funds earned for non-classroom components for the purpose of employing a building manager for a school. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 830 | |
2012-04-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-03-29 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/29/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2982 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 830