TN HB2947 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 667
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 667
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts from income taxes the income from trust funds for perpetual care of a cemetery. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, exempts from income taxes the income from trust funds for perpetual care of a cemetery. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 667 | |
2012-04-11 | Effective date(s) 07/01/12 | |
2012-04-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-03-27 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-22 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-03-22 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-22 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-02-27 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-02-23 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 PNV 1 | |
2012-02-16 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/23/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/16/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 2/8/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to s/c Commerce Subcommittee | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3539 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 667