TN HB2941 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 11 to 20 inches and from 17 to 30 inches the height and width requirements of signage required to be prominently displayed in a substance-free recovery residence not recognized or certified by an organization or funded by a state or federal department or agency. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 33; Title 47; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6; Title 33; Title 47; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to alcohol and drug services.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2934 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Deferred to Summer Study