TN HB2913 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the levy of a privilege tax, not to exceed 2 percent, on the purchase of prepared food from restaurants, cafes, cafeterias, caterers, and other similar establishments. - Amends Chapter 91 of the Private Acts of 2008.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes the levy of a privilege tax, not to exceed 2 percent, on the purchase of prepared food from restaurants, cafes, cafeterias, caterers, and other similar establishments. - Amends Chapter 91 of the Private Acts of 2008.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-04-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 4/17/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2913&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB2913.pdf |