TN HB2911 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases number of persons serving on the board of education from nine to 10 members. - Amends Chapter 118 of the Private Acts of 2002.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 118 of the Private Acts of 2002; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Polk County Board of Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Pr. Ch. 64 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0916) |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2929 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 64