TN SB2929 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases number of persons serving on the board of education from nine to 10 members. - Amends Chapter 118 of the Private Acts of 2002.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 118 of the Private Acts of 2002; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Polk County Board of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 64 | |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2911 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 64