TN HB2906 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, reduces the number of aldermen from seven to five; reduces the number of readings required to pass an ordinance from three to two. - Amends Chapter 115 of the Private Acts of 2006.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 115 of the Private Acts of 2006; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Town of Petersburg.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42 | |
2022-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-03-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2924 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-14 - Pr. Ch. 42