TN HB2904 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases from 5 percent to 9 percent the hotel occupancy tax; changes the designations of the tax proceeds. - Amends Chapter 98 of the Private Acts of 1983; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, increases from 5 percent to 9 percent the hotel occupancy tax; changes the designations of the tax proceeds. - Amends Chapter 98 of the Private Acts of 1983; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 64, Nays 18, PNV 5 |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2913 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn.