TN HB2888 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Pr. Ch. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Pr. Ch. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases the term of mayor from two to four years; authorizes the board of mayor and aldermen to appoint a city administrator. - Amends Chapter 38 of the Private Acts of 1985; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 38 of the Private Acts of 1985; as amended by Chapter 191 of the Private Acts of 1986; Chapter 121 of the Private Acts of 2000; as amended by Chapter 1 of the Private Acts of 2003; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter for the City of Bradford.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Pr. Ch. 45 | |
2022-04-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2907 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-14 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 45