TN HB2882 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from 30 calendar days to 30 business days, the period within which the executive committee may disapprove, modify, or otherwise change any action taken by the board of trustees related to the retirement system, before such action of the board becomes final. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.
Title
As introduced, extends, from 30 calendar days to 30 business days, the period within which the executive committee may disapprove, modify, or otherwise change any action taken by the board of trustees related to the retirement system, before such action of the board becomes final. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2544 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee