TN HB2879 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of state to maintain a printable Tennessee residential property condition disclosure form on the department's website for use by the public. - Amends TCA Title 12; Title 13; Title 29; Title 49; Title 66 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of state to maintain a printable Tennessee residential property condition disclosure form on the department's website for use by the public. - Amends TCA Title 12; Title 13; Title 29; Title 49; Title 66 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2232 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee