TN HB2863 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony, the penalty for a second or subsequent offense of aggravated reckless driving; requires a person who commits a second or subsequent offense of aggravated reckless driving to attend a driver education course and to have their license suspended for at least six months; requires law enforcement to seize a person's vehicle and crush, destroy, or sell the vehicle upon a second or subsequent offense of aggravated reckless driving. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, relative to reckless driving.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2645 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024