TN HB2861 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a healthcare provider from coercing a person, including a person who has legal authority to make healthcare decisions for a child, to consent to a vaccination, misleading or misrepresenting that a vaccination is required by state law when state law provides an exemption, or misleading or misrepresenting that a newborn screening test is required by state law. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 4; Title 49 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 4; Title 49 and Title 63, relative to public health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1043 | |
2024-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2151 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-31 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024