TN HB2860 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the importation, sale, and distribution of cell-cultured food products in this state. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 44; Title 47 and Title 53.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40; Title 44; Title 47 and Title 53, relative to cell-cultured food products.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee- Government Operations for Review |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2870 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee