TN HB2860 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to create a phone app for citizens to search and apply for programs that use TANF funds. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 13; Title 33; Title 49; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to create a phone app for citizens to search and apply for programs that use TANF funds. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 13; Title 33; Title 49; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] |
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2665 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020