TN HB2856 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 876
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 876
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that law permits prosecution and conviction for displaying sexual activity to a minor by electronic communication regardless of whether the victim is a minor or an undercover police officer posing as a minor. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that law permits prosecution and conviction for displaying sexual activity to a minor by electronic communication regardless of whether the victim is a minor or an undercover police officer posing as a minor. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 876 | |
2012-05-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/12 | |
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-04-18 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-04-18 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-17 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-16 | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-16 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-03-19 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-15 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-08 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 2/29/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2012-01-25 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2605 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 876