TN HB2851 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the office of the comptroller of the treasury to include in any audit conducted by the office of a governing board of a public institution of higher education an examination into whether each institution governed by the board is complying with the equal protection provisions of the Tennessee and United States constitutions in the institution's admission program and practices. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9 and Title 49, Chapter 7, relative to higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | No Action Taken |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2822 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 22, PNV 0