TN HB2844 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 995
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 995
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that for a municipal election not held in conjunction with any other election, if a polling place is located outside of the boundaries of a municipality but the precinct the polling place serves includes residents of the municipality, then the election commission may designate a polling place outside, but closest to the geographic precinct within the limits of the municipality, the precinct it is to serve. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, specifies that for a municipal election not held in conjunction with any other election, if a polling place is located outside of the boundaries of a municipality but the precinct the polling place serves includes residents of the municipality, then the election commission may designate a polling place outside, but closest to the geographic precinct within the limits of the municipality, the precinct it is to serve. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 1 & 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 995 | |
2012-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/12 | |
2012-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-05-01 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-30 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-24 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 & 2, Ayes 88, Nays 7 | |
2012-04-23 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-23 | S. adopted am. 2 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2012-04-18 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-03-26 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-03-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-22 | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 10 | |
2012-03-15 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-02-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-01-25 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2818 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 995