TN HB2830 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a person to file a petition for an injunction to prohibit the delivery of the remains of a victim of certain homicide offenses to the next of kin, if the next of kin is found to have committed the offense by a preponderance of the evidence; requires a court issuing such an injunction to include in its order the next person to whom the remains must be delivered. - Amends TCA Title 31; Title 38; Title 46 and Title 62.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 31; Title 38; Title 46 and Title 62, relative to victims of homicide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2722 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee